Onunkwo, Ifeanyi Kodilinye Ugochukwu (CPSO#: 110977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nigeria, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Kodis Clinic
200-240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone: (519) 601-4999
Fax: (519) 601-4997
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Onunkwo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Onunkwo ( CPSO# 110977)

Business Address:
Dr. Kodi's Clinic
200 - 240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 601-4999

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IFEANYI KODILINYE UGOCHUKWU ONUNKWO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONUNKWO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2017