Orava, Matthew Victor (CPSO#: 98099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 792-3333
Fax: (705) 728-4120
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Family Medicine Clinic
555 Essa Rd. Unit 28
Barrie ON  L4N 6A9
Canada
Phone: (705) 721-1689
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Barrie Family Medicine Clinic
121 Wellington St. W. - Suite 112
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Canada
Phone: (705) 721-1689
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Barrie Family Medicine Clinic
125 Bell Farm Rd. Ste 101
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Canada
Phone: (705) 721-1689
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Barrie Family Medicine Clinic
829 Big Bay Point Rd. Unit D2
Barrie ON  L4M 4S6
Canada
Phone: (705) 721-1689
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.V. Orava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Orava ( CPSO# 98099 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-3333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW VICTOR ORAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORAVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014