Orlov, David (CPSO#: 90848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Room 3-EN
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Orlov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Orlov ( CPSO# 90848 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital-UHN
Department of Anaesthesia
Room 3 Eaton North
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ORLOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORLOV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 31 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014