Orser, Beverley Anne (CPSO#: 51317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beverley Orser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Orser ( CPSO# 51317 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEVERLEY ANNE ORSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORSER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1987