Oshidari, Alborz (CPSO#: 64671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Iranian, Persian

Education:National University of Iran, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Sutherland Drive
Lyndhurst Hospital
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 6129
Fax: (416) 422-5402
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.Oshidari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zare Parsi ( CPSO# 56180 )
Dr. A. Oshidari ( CPSO# 64671 )

Business Address:
Lyndhurst Hospital
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (905) 881-0264

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBORZ OSHIDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSHIDARI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1994