Osmun, William Edward (CPSO#: 31652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Feb 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone: 705-285-3850
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

255 Elizabeth Street
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
Phone: 519-291-3120
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

St Mary's Memorial Hospital
267 Queen St W
St Marys ON  N4X 1B6
Canada
Phone: 519-284-1332
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. E. Osmun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Osmun ( CPSO# 31652 )

Business Address:
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 284-3450

Business Address:
267 Queen Street West
St Marys ON  N4X 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 284-1332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM EDWARD OSMUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSMUN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 1988