Ostrowska, Krystyna Irena (CPSO#: 54452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-0447
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Sherway Dr.
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: 416 521 4082
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Ostrowska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ostrowska ( CPSO# 54452 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Medical Microbiology Laboratory
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 521-4196

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 09 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA IRENA OSTROWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTROWSKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1989