Owens, Erinn Leigh (CPSO#: 70074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 20B
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 747-1200
Fax: (519) 747-1560
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erinn Owens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Owens ( CPSO# 70074 )

Business Address:
Unit 20B
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 747-1200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERINN LEIGH OWENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998