Oyenubi, Ademilola Nasima (CPSO#: 76702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Lagos, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: (905) 472-7621
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ademilola Oyenubi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oyenubi ( CPSO# 76702 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEMILOLA NASIMA OYENUBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYENUBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005