Oyewumi, Lamidi Kolawole (CPSO#: 42390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7011
Fax: (905) 472-7371
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.K. Oyewumi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Oyewumi ( CPSO# 42390 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAMIDI KOLAWOLE OYEWUMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYEWUMI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988