Oyston, John Peter (CPSO#: 57882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Anaesthesia Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8133
Fax: (416) 431-8151
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Oyston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oyston ( CPSO# 57882 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Anaesthesia Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8133

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PETER OYSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1989