Pachai, Indira (CPSO#: 55040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Naidoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Pachai ( CPSO# 55040 )
Dr. J. Naidoo ( CPSO# 54688 )

Business Address:
LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Health Information Services and Document Storage Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 23 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INDIRA PACHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACHAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1985