Padanilathu Kunjummar, Shakkeela (CPSO#: 80243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Malayalam, Tamil, Urdu

Education:Mysore University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
200 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2N4
Phone: (905) 853-8525
Fax: (905) 853-8530
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UNIT 1D
6884, 14 TH AVENUE
Markham ON  L6B 1A8
Canada
Phone: (905) 554-1517
Fax: (905) 554-2760
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shakkeela Padanilathu Kunjummar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Padanilathu Kunjummar ( CPSO# 80243 )

Business Address:
Suite 1D
6884 14th Avenue
Markham ON  L6B 1A8
Phone Number: (905) 554-1517

Business Address:
Unit 4
200 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 853-8525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAKKEELA PADANILATHU KUNJUMMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PADANILATHU KUNJUMMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2003 to 01 Apr 2004
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008