Pallie, Sven (CPSO#: 59730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone: (905) 646-2525
Fax: (905) 646-3251
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Pallie & D. Pallie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pallie ( CPSO# 58280 )
Dr. S. Pallie ( CPSO# 59730 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone Number: (905) 646-2525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SVEN PALLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALLIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989