Palmay, Christine Alexandra (CPSO#: 84251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Midtown Health And Wellness
Clinic
Suite 602
110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 2Y1
Phone: (416) 486-3300
Fax: (416) 486-9433
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Palmay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Palmay ( CPSO# 84251 )

Business Address:
The Midtown Health and Wellness Clinic
Suite 602
110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 2Y1
Phone Number: (416) 486-3300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ALEXANDRA PALMAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALMAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008