Pandey, Amritanshu Shekhar (CPSO#: 63944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 6V6
Phone: (519) 624-3511
Fax: (519) 624-3411
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph Medical Imaging
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Canada
Phone: (519) 767-0550
Fax: (519) 767-2918
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Shekhar Pandey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pandey ( CPSO# 63944 )

Business Address:
150 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 6V6
Phone Number: (519) 624-3511

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMRITANSHU SHEKHAR PANDEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 27 Feb 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992