Pandey, Anil Kumar (CPSO#: 51352)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Jiwaji University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 Barbican Trail
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 680-1952
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anil Kumar Pandey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pandey ( CPSO# 51352 )

Business Address:
14 Barbican Trail
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 680-1952

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL KUMAR PANDEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1987