Pankowski, Dahlia Kimberley (CPSO#: 84291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 787-0323
Fax: (416) 787-8094
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. D. Nahon ( CPSO# 81227 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776


Corporation Name: Dahlia K. Pankowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )

Business Address:
101 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-0323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAHLIA KIMBERLEY PANKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009