Panos, Leonidas (CPSO#: 52784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8133
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Panos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Panos ( CPSO# 52784 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONIDAS PANOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1984