Paolone, John Anthony (CPSO#: 32712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Sep 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone: (905) 988-1223
Fax: (905) 988-3783
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John A. Paolone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Paolone ( CPSO# 32712 )

Business Address:
108 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 988-1223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., September 14, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. John Anthony Paolone:

                  (i)   Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete
                        College-facilitated instruction in Ethic within 12 months of this
                        Order; and
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete
                        College-facilitated instruction in Record-Keeping within 12 months
                        of this Order, and shall cooperate with a re-assessment of his
                        medical records by representatives of the College within 6-12
                        months of his completion of the record-keeping course.  

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Sep 2012
Summary:

       

 The Committee accepted as true all of the facts set out in the Agreed Statement of Facts. 
 Having regard to these facts, the Committee accepted Dr. Paolone’s admission and found that 
  he committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission 
                                                                              
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
      Therefore, having stated the finding in paragraph 1 of its written order of September 14, 2012, 
on the matter of penalty and costs, the Committee ordered and directed that:  

2. Dr. Paolone attend before this panel to be reprimanded.  

3. the Registrar suspend Dr. Paolone’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, to 
commence Monday, September 17, 2012.  

4. the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Paolone’s certificate of 
registration: 

(i) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete College-facilitated instruction in Ethics 
within 12 months of this Order; and 

 (ii) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete College-facilitated instruction in Record-
Keeping within 12 months of this Order, and shall cooperate with a re-assessment of his medical records 
by representatives of the College within 6-12 months of his completion of the record-keeping course.  

5. Dr. Paolone pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this 
order.  

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 14, 2012