Papastergiou, Derek Leslie (CPSO#: 72514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
520 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2T 2Z6
Phone: (519) 741-0115
Fax: 519-745-3684
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Papastergiou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Papastergiou ( CPSO# 72514 )

Business Address:
201 - 520 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2T 2Z6
Phone Number: (519) 741-0115

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK LESLIE PAPASTERGIOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPASTERGIOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2001