Paquette, Lise Jeanne (CPSO#: 57036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 924-7799
Fax: (416) 924-8243
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lise Paquette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Paquette ( CPSO# 57036 )

Business Address:
Suite 408
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 924-7799

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISE JEANNE PAQUETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAQUETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1988