Parekh, Neal Ashok (CPSO#: 82968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: (416) 289-0187
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1835 Yonge St.
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-792-9436
Fax: 416-792-9438
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Stroke Clinic
Building B
2202-3000 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Canada
Phone: 416-431-9713
Fax: 416-431-5259
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neal Parekh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Parekh ( CPSO# 82968 )
Dr. R. Mahtani ( CPSO# 82950 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-0185

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite B2202
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 431-9713

Business Address:
303 - 1835 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 792-9436

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEAL ASHOK PAREKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAREKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010