Parikh, Amish (CPSO#: 75058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
West Toronto Site
Suite 102
190 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 622-4762
Fax: (416) 622-4763
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site,100 Queensway West
Diabetes Management Centre, 2nd Flr
Clinical and Administrative Bldg.
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7545
Fax: (905) 804-7955
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amish Parikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Parikh ( CPSO# 75058 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7545

Business Address:
102 - 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 622-4762

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMISH PARIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004