Parikh, Sagar V (CPSO#: 58880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U of Michigan Depression Center
4250 Plymouth Road
Ann Arbor MI  48109-2700
United States
Phone: (734) 232-0175
Fax: (734) 763-2015
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 6508
Fax: (416) 603-5368
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAGAR V PARIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARIKH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987