Park, Hae-Ryun (CPSO#: 79844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Hanyang University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute, Mental Health
Geriatric Psychiatry
PO Box 5777, Stn B
London ON  N6A 4V3
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47374
Fax: (519) 455-7151
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hae-Ryun Park Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Park ( CPSO# 79844 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute, Mental Health
Geriatric Psychiatry
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 455-5110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAE-RYUN PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008