Park, Myung Ill (CPSO#: 63403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Oct 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Kyungpook National University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone: (647) 449-6074
Fax: (416) 630-7381
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 4
3585 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-2288
Fax: (416) 398-2588
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Myung I. Park Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Park ( CPSO# 63403 )

Business Address:
4 - 3585 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288

Business Address:
201 - 1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 630-7388

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 21 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 21 Oct 2013 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 21, 2013, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Myung Ill Park, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Park to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            Dr. Myung Ill Park may not engage in any medical practice save and except for:

                  (i)   endoscopies and associated consultations;
                  (ii)  colonoscopies and associated consultations; and 
                  (iii) as a surgical assistant when a College-approved surgeon is
                        performing the surgery as the most responsible physician and is in
                        attendance for the duration of the procedure.