Parker, Frederick Alden (CPSO#: 59319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Guildwood Parkway
Unit 5
Scarborough ON  M1E 4V2
Phone: (416) 269-5088
Fax: (416) 261-3112
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Parker ( CPSO# 59319 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
123 Guildwood Parkway
Scarborough ON  M1E 4V2
Phone Number: (416) 269-5088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK ALDEN PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989