Parker, Vivien Mary (CPSO#: 68883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Compass ACT Team
2nd Floor
671 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1L3
Phone: (416) 461-2000 Ext. 288
Fax: (416) 461-2222
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 416 469 6580
Fax: 416 461 2222
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vivien Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Parker ( CPSO# 68883 )

Business Address:
Compass ACT team
Suite 203
177 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 461-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIEN MARY PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000