Parlea, Luciana (CPSO#: 80772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 405
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (226) 772-0001
Fax: (519) 579-2138
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luciana Parlea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Parlea ( CPSO# 80772 )

Business Address:
Unit 405
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (226) 772-0001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCIANA PARLEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARLEA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009