Parmar, Gurpreet Singh (CPSO#: 77804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 848-7900
Fax: (905) 615-8537
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gurpreet Singh Parmar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Parmar ( CPSO# 77804 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 848-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH PARMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2013