Parravano, Joseph Giuseppe (CPSO#: 51360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811 Ext. 3825
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1St Floor
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 465-5735
Fax: (416) 465-1402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dufferin Specialty Clinic
1664 Dufferin St.
Toronto ON  M1R 3G7
Canada
Phone: (416) 652-6101
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph G. Parravano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parravano ( CPSO# 51360 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
658 Danforth Avenue
1st Floor
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone Number: (416) 848-0860

Business Address:
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1


Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph G. Parravano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parravano ( CPSO# 51360 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
658 Danforth Avenue
1st Floor
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone Number: (416) 848-0860

Business Address:
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Nevada

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH GIUSEPPE PARRAVANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARRAVANO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1983