Parrish, Michael Brian (CPSO#: 68949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46698
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Parrish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 22 2014


Corporation Name: Parrish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Parrish ( CPSO# 68949 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences - General Site
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRIAN PARRISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARRISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000