Partap, Vince Anand (CPSO#: 74251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2004
Fax: (905) 883-0772
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L6Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2251
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Partap Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Partap ( CPSO# 74251 )

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Unit 3-4-5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3


Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. De Maio ( CPSO# 86122 )
Dr. F. Budhani ( CPSO# 86329 )
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 69076 )
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 50334 )
Dr. P. Buckler ( CPSO# 79394 )
Dr. R. Graham ( CPSO# 30863 )
Dr. R. Hany ( CPSO# 54238 )
Dr. G. Hochman ( CPSO# 33401 )
Dr. S. Isaacson ( CPSO# 55070 )
Dr. N. Just ( CPSO# 70679 )
Dr. N. Langhorne ( CPSO# 68045 )
Dr. F. Lan ( CPSO# 72316 )
Dr. P. Law ( CPSO# 69001 )
Dr. J. McKee ( CPSO# 33512 )
Dr. V. Partap ( CPSO# 74251 )
Dr. M. Rooney ( CPSO# 51506 )
Dr. E. Silmberg ( CPSO# 71544 )
Dr. Y. Siow ( CPSO# 66696 )
Dr. P. Stroz ( CPSO# 59469 )
Dr. L. Thain ( CPSO# 59614 )
Dr. D. Boparai ( CPSO# 81452 )
Dr. B. Yeung ( CPSO# 77885 )
Dr. P. Zia ( CPSO# 71413 )

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
Unit 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCE ANAND PARTAP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARTAP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 01 Jan 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001