Parveen, Nighat (CPSO#: 87175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Sind, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Hospital
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1
Phone: (416) 281-7301 Ext. 0
Fax: 4162817465
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nighat Parveen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Parveen ( CPSO# 87175 )

Business Address:
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4C1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIGHAT PARVEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARVEEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008