Patel, Bhavin Bhupendra (CPSO#: 81923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Emergency Medicine
William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dept of Emergency Medicine
William Osler Health Systems
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2125 Wyecroft Road Unit
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Canada
Phone: 905-842-7051
Fax: 905-842-8216
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

William Osler Health
Peel Memorial Hospital
20 Lynch St, Brampton, ON L6W 2Z8
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Unit 9 6400 Millcreek Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Canada
Phone: (905) 858-1368
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

425-1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-7080
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhavin B. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Patel ( CPSO# 81923 )

Business Address:
2125 Wyecroft Road
Suite 6
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone Number: (905) 842-7051

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences/St. Joseph's Healthcare
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
Suite 425
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 438-7080

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BHAVIN BHUPENDRA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 20 Sep 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 13 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2006