Patel, Joan Susan (CPSO#: 31555)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 29 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Susan Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Whitehills Medical Centre 1225 Wonderland Road North London ON N6G 2V9
Date Received: 27 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Mar 2018