Patel, Kirit Becharbhai (CPSO#: 50025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Nairobi, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 272-9993
Fax: (905) 272-9427
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. B. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Patel ( CPSO# 50025 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (905) 272-9993

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRIT BECHARBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1983