Patel, Kirit Mahendra (CPSO#: 69386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ajax Pickering General Hospital
Ajax Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 1288
Fax: (905) 428-5344
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirit Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Patel ( CPSO# 69386 )

Business Address:
300 - 1131 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8

Business Address:
5400 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 5R5

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System - Ajax Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Timmins & District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Cochrane ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
Whitby Mental Health Centre
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 430-4055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRIT MAHENDRA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1995