Patel, Rupa Vinu (CPSO#: 66574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Community Health Center
263 Weller Avenue
Kingston ON  K7K 2V4
Phone: 613-542-2949
Fax: 613-542-7657
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patel and Sylvester Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sylvester ( CPSO# 66579 )
Dr. R. Patel ( CPSO# 66574 )

Business Address:
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2506

Business Address:
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone Number: (613) 546-1858

Business Address:
78 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUPA VINU PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 28 Feb 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1995