Patel, Samir (CPSO#: 72454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Radiology
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350 Ext. 2742
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samir Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel ( CPSO# 72454 )

Business Address:
235 Union Street
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Radiology
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIR PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2010