Patel, Sanjay Maganbhai (CPSO#: 90723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patel & Dr. Murthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel ( CPSO# 90723 )
Dr. T. Murthy ( CPSO# 84530 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 336-4109

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY MAGANBHAI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jan 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2013