Patmanidis, Stefanos (CPSO#: 32986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 1981

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Alexandria, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 12308
5100 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T3
Phone: (416) 747-3586
Fax: (905) 265-8345
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber college blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 32362
Fax: (416) 747-3350
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stefanos Patmanidis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patmanidis ( CPSO# 32986 )

Business Address:
5100 Rutherford Road
P.O. Box 12308
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 747-9111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEFANOS PATMANIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATMANIDIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1981

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)