Paul, Thomas Gordon (CPSO#: 59451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Radiology Consultants
121 Wellington Street West
Suite 114-115
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone: (705) 726-4531
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 1G4
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. G. Paul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2009

Dr. T. Paul ( CPSO# 59451 )

Business Address:
Little Lake Health Centre
LL01 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 722-8036

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Barrie Medical Arts
121 Wellington Street West
Suites 114-115
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone Number: (705) 726-4531

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie


Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. THOMAS GORDON PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989