Pautler, Stephen Edward (CPSO#: 68971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Urology
St Joseph's Health Care
P O Box 5777 STN B
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6384
Fax: (519) 646-6037
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. E. Pautler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pautler ( CPSO# 68971 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Westminster Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 858-8500

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Division of Urology
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6384

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN EDWARD PAUTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUTLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002