Pavlova, Viktoria Valeriyevna (CPSO#: 83130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Arkhangelsk State Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ancaster Medical Centre
Suite 204
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone: 289-445-1071
Fax: 289-855-2838
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Viktoria Pavlova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Pavlova ( CPSO# 83130 )

Business Address:
Ancaster Medical Centre
204 - 1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-6561

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 14 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKTORIA VALERIYEVNA PAVLOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAVLOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2007 to 14 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2008 to 14 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2009 to 14 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009