Pawaroo, Patricia Smriti Ram (CPSO#: 73519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: Ram, Patricia Smriti (used until: 21 Aug 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
999, 5111 47th Street NE
Calgary AB  T3J 3R2
Phone: (403) 428-4411
Fax: (403) 428-4410
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Pawaroo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 15 Nov 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA SMRITI RAM PAWAROO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWAROO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2001