Peachey, Gregory Owen (CPSO#: 64676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33853
Fax: (905) 521-6019
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Peachey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Peachey ( CPSO# 64676 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care Centre
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY OWEN PEACHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEACHEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1995