Pearce, Dawn Heather (CPSO#: 65503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 6328
Fax: (416) 864-5380
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )
Dr. J. Barfett ( CPSO# 84352 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Dawn Pearce Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAWN HEATHER PEARCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1993