Pearson, Brooke Edward (CPSO#: 29044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
379 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N5
Phone: (519) 512-0030
Fax: (519) 512-0051
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brooke Pearson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pearson ( CPSO# 29044 )

Business Address:
379 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N5
Phone Number: (519) 512-0030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BROOKE EDWARD PEARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1979